This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 11:15:00 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE VS CENTURY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 GAINESVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CENTURY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

REED TANYA

Defendant

CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLANE WILLIAM J III

210 N University Dr Flr 6

Coral Springs, FL 33071-7392

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

05/19/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/31/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/26/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less