This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/15/2020 at 00:04:05 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE MRI VS DIRECT CO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 GAINESVILLE MRI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT CO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1226

JONES LATERRION

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1226

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

 

Court Documents

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/11/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163440; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163440; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less