This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:06:51 (UTC).

G STEINER VS NAOMI DECKARD

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 G STEINER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NAOMI DECKARD. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEINER GEORGE

Defendants

DECKARD NAOMI

Palm Bay, FL 32909-8576

SUTTON THERESA

Palm Bay, FL 32909-8576

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/25/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/25/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

04/25/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

04/28/2022: PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

04/28/2022: PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

05/04/2022: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S219441; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 148322213; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $20.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GOLUB GEOFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S219441; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 148322213; Event Description: PMT:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GOLUB GEOFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EJECTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB GEOFFREY