This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/16/2020 at 06:05:46 (UTC).

G GILSON VS SECURITY FIRST

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 G GILSON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILSON GERTRUDE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS NADIA

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810-5912

LASLO JESSICA L

1900 Summit Tower Boulevard

Orlando, FL 32801-

ORPHEE NATHALIE

1900 Summit Tower Boulevard, Tower Place Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32810

SEXTON JASON J

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810-5912

 

Court Documents

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/07/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY THE INSURANCE COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

12/02/2019: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY THE INSURANCE COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/15/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/15/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/15/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/15/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/04/2020: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:00 PM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#5) CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less