This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/10/2020 at 18:41:05 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR VS DAVID J FORMANEK

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 FORD MOTOR filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID J FORMANEK. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

FORMANEK DAVID J

Palm Bay, FL 32907-2048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGINO MICHAEL J

C/O Moody, Jones & Ingino Pa, 1333 S University Dr Ste 201

Plantation, FL 33324-4022

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

08/01/2020: ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/16/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/25/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • DocketALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MOTION TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN: COUNTY CIVIL; Disposition Date: 08/01/2020; Disposition Description: CIV/FAM-ALL REOPEN EVNT CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketREOPEN FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163394; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL J INGINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163394; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL J INGINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000; Disposition Date: 05/08/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less