This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 03:54:03 (UTC).

FLINN VS STATE FARM MUTUAL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 FLINN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLINN CHIROPRACTIC LLC

LOVE ALANA

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, Service Of Process Section Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRONICK STEVEN ADAM

13506 Summerport Village Pkwy Ste 411

Windermere, FL 34786-7366

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/18/2022: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/18/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/18/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/21/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234569; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161572917; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KRONICK STEVEN ADAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234569; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161572917; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 100 - 500; Amount: $80.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KRONICK STEVEN ADAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT $100 - $500; Disposition Date: 12/02/2022; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLINN CHIROPRACTIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRONICK STEVEN ADAM