This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/02/2022 at 07:15:06 (UTC).

FLAGSHIP VS RAUL GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 FLAGSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against RAUL GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

GUTIERREZ RAUL

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECHOLS BERT

1715 Aaron Brenner Dr Ste 800

Memphis, TN 38120-1445

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/23/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/23/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

04/05/2021: ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/08/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

04/23/2021: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/09/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

06/15/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 03:00 PM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Result: CR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 03:00 PM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REPLEVIN; Disposition Date: 06/15/2021; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT REPLEVIN; Amount: 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECHOLS BERT