This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 13:02:11 (UTC).

FIDELITY TITLE INS VS H DOLPHY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 FIDELITY TITLE INS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against H DOLPHY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DOLPHY HOPETON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTROVSKY ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/25/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

COVER SHEET

01/25/2023: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

05/08/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH WITH NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S238650; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 165457964; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: OSTROVSKY ALEXANDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S238650; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 165457964; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: OSTROVSKY ALEXANDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 05/08/2023; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less