This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 12/04/2021 at 10:29:12 (UTC).

EXECUTIVE FINANCIAL VS G GOSS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 EXECUTIVE FINANCIAL filed an Other lawsuit against G GOSS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXECUTIVE FINANCIAL ENTERPRISES INC

10245 E Via Linda

Scottsdale, AZ 85258-5315

CHASE BANK USA NA

Defendant

GOSS GARY E

Mims, FL 32754-4737

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN NOAM JAY

13899 Biscayne Blvd Ste 305

North Miami Beach, FL 33181-1647

Defendant Attorney

STEWART BRANDON J

500 Winderley Pl Ste 100

Maitland, FL 32751-7406

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/27/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

09/30/2021: NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL

09/30/2021: RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL

AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/27/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/27/2021: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/11/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED

10/21/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

10/29/2021: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT EVENT

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF COURT EVENT

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

EXHIBIT LIST

11/23/2021: EXHIBIT LIST

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:15 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B210209; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: NOAM J COHEN PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCV CASE TYPE CHANGE/SRS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF COURT EVENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: CV CASE TYPE CHANGE/SRS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S207305; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 137409585; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY GARNISHMENT FEE; Amount: $85.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: COHEN NOAM JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketASM: CTY CIVIL COPY PER PAGE; Amount: 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketASM: POSTAGE; Amount: 7.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketASM: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount: 42.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketASM: CO RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketASM: CO RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXECUTIVE FINANCIAL ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cohen, Noam Jay