This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 10/19/2021 at 10:49:36 (UTC).

EVE MORRIS VS THOMAS DEROSA

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 EVE MORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS DEROSA. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORRIS EVE B

MORRIS JOHN F

Defendants

DEROSA THOMAS V JR

Melbourne, FL 32904-7362

OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLATT JACK L

175 E Nasa Blvd Ste 300

Melbourne, FL 32901-1998

Defendant Attorneys

DOMINGUEZBAGGETT NIRIA LUCIA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

MOORE CHRISTOPHER S

729 Sw Federal Hwy Ste 222

Stuart, FL 34994-2913

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/18/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/18/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/18/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/18/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

06/18/2021: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/15/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/08/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

08/24/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/24/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/23/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

08/13/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

06/18/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#47) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#46) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#41) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#40) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLATT JACK L