This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 03:03:28 (UTC).

ENTERPRISE VS DWAYNE REMBERT

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 ENTERPRISE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DWAYNE REMBERT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

REMBERT DWAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUSS RAMIRO

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

01/05/2023: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

MOTION FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

02/07/2023: MOTION FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: B213126; Party: P 1; Memo: TRANSFERR FEE; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: POLLOCK ROSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED ORIG PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less