This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/12/2020 at 06:23:14 (UTC).

ELSIE JEAN COLWELL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 ELSIE JEAN COLWELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STRAGEA JACK M

Barefoot Bay, FL 32976-7095

Decedents

COLWELL ELSIE J

Barefoot Bay, FL 32976-7095

COLWELL ELSIE JEAN

Barefoot Bay, FL 32976-7095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EVANS JOHN G

1565 Us Highway 1

Sebastian, FL 32958-3895

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#9) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#8) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S169747; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RAUL ANTONIO PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#7) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA - RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketASM: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketASM: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163103; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: FORMAL ADMIN < $25000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DE2018 PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FORMAL ADMINISTRATION < 60000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN < $25000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less