This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/27/2020 at 11:37:37 (UTC).

ELOUSE NICHOLAS VS TOWER HILL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 ELOUSE NICHOLAS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TOWER HILL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLAS ELOUSE

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MINEO PETER JR

5600 Davie Road

Davie, FL 33301

SANTANA ALEXANDER

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324-3292

Defendant Attorney

DOPSON-RODRIGUEZ JOCELYN

111 N Orange Ave Ste 2000

Orlando, FL 32801-2327

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

08/06/2020: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

08/06/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/20/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/26/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/26/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/24/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/24/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

02/24/2020: COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less