This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 02/24/2021 at 20:26:32 (UTC).

ELLEN WALDEN VS A OLIVEIRA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 ELLEN WALDEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A OLIVEIRA. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN ELLEN

Defendants

OLIVEIRA MARCIA

Elizabeth, NJ 07208-1506

OLIVEIRA ANTONIO

Elizabeth, NJ 07208-1506

HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS INC

1999 Bryan St Ste 900, C/O National Registered Agents Inc

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTAS KAREN M

1290 Us Highway 1

Rockledge, FL 32955-2712

Defendant Attorneys

TORRES ANNA D

Po Box 2849

West Palm Beach, FL 33402-2849

RUBIO ARMANDO P

Two Alhambra Plaza Ste 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG

09/10/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/27/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

04/21/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/13/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/09/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/13/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/11/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/09/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY RESIDENTIAL; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(#38) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PREMISES LIABLITY RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY RESIDENTIAL; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTAS KAREN M