This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/20/2023 at 10:20:39 (UTC).

ELLA AUSTIN VS CITIZENS PROP

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 ELLA AUSTIN filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUSTIN ELLA G

COCHRANE GREGORY D

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORP

200 E Gaines St, Florida Chief Financial Officer Registered Agent

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTMAN ALEXIS

925 S Federal Hwy Ste 600

Boca Raton, FL 33432-6145

Defendant Attorney

ROTHELL KRISTI BERGEMANN

1555 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Suite 301

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/23/2022: COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/23/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/23/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/23/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

12/01/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/11/2023: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/23/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#22) DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#20) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#19) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#17) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less