This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 22:42:35 (UTC).

EAST COAST VS MCSHANE CONSTRUC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 EAST COAST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCSHANE CONSTRUC. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST COAST PLUMBING CO INC

Defendants

CONTINENTAL 436 FUND LLC

Co Ct Corporation System Ra, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC

Co Ct Corporation System Ra, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITEHEAD ALLAN P

2200 Front St Ste 301

Melbourne, FL 32901-7389

Defendant Attorneys

DANNECKER JOHN H

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801-5403

ROGERS MAUREEN K

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801-3382

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/05/2019: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/05/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/05/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

08/05/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

08/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

08/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

09/24/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

09/24/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/04/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/09/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

JOINDER

10/09/2019: JOINDER

JOINDER

10/10/2019: JOINDER

NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION

10/10/2019: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

10/14/2019: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 01/03/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL 436 FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAUREEN ROGERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN DANNECKER