This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:07:45 (UTC).

EARTHA BARTON

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 EARTHA BARTON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HAMILTON DONALD J

Mims, FL 32754-3912

HAMILTON DONALD

Mims, FL 32754-3912

Not Yet Classified

PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER

C/O 1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Decedents

BARTON EARTHA

Mims, FL 32754-4009

BARTON EARTHA OLA

Mims, FL 32754-4009

BARTON EARTHA O

Mims, FL 32754-4009

Interested Party

HAMILTON DERRICK

Mims, FL 32754-4009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROOME CHRISTOPHER E

915 S Washington Ave

Titusville, FL 32780-8404

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HOSTETLER ERIC L

1990 W New Haven Ave 2Nd Floor

Melbourne, FL 32904-3922

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S221593; Party: PT 1; Memo: EFILING # 149987331; Event Description: PMT: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BROOME CHRISTOPHER E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S221593; Party: PT 1; Memo: EFILING # 149987331; Event Description: PMT: FORMAL ADMIN < $25000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BROOME CHRISTOPHER E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FORMAL ADMINISTRATION < 60000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION NO FEDERAL TAX RETURN DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketASM: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN < $25000; Amount: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2008
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B55462; Party: CR 1; Event Description: PMT: CAVEAT FILING FEE; Amount: $36.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: VANCE LOTANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CAVEAT; Disposition Date: 02/08/2008; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • DocketASM: CAVEAT FILING FEE; Amount: 36.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • Docket(#1) CAVEAT BY CREDITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOME CHRISTOPHER E