This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 00:01:19 (UTC).

E M PEPE VS ALL MY SONS MOVING

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 E M PEPE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL MY SONS MOVING. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEPE ELIZABETH M

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-3573

Defendant

ALLMY SONS MOVING STORAGE MELBOURNE INC

2459 Cheney Hwy Ste 64

Titusville, FL 32780-6724

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

08/12/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

08/11/2020: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

06/18/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

02/18/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

01/31/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E828131; Party: P 1; Memo: ALIAS SUMMONS; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PEPE ELIZABETH M

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER COUNTY CIVIL 5001 - 8000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822433; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PEPE ELIZABETH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822433; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PEPE ELIZABETH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less