This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 16:40:09 (UTC).

DOR VS RONALD SNYDER

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DOR filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against RONALD SNYDER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A SEGAL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DILLS BRITTANY

Melbourne, FL 32935-6679

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Respondent

SNYDER RONALD

Melbourne, FL 32935-6746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SUPPORT DOR CASE; Disposition Date: 05/28/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SUPPORT-DOR CASE; Judge: ROBERT A SEGAL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant