This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 16:36:58 (UTC).

DOR VS JAMES WYATT IV

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DOR filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JAMES WYATT IV. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTINA SERRANO, LINDA PEREZ and KURT ERLENBACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHRISTINA SERRANO

LINDA PEREZ

KURT ERLENBACH

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

STATON DEVA CAROL

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-3532

Respondent

WYATT JAMES RILEY

Rockledge, FL 32955-3953

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket(#12) ER: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (IV-D) (TITLE IV-D OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT) RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:30 AM; Judge: KURT ERLENBACH; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#11) SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE THE SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: LINDA PEREZ; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketRSGN:COORDINATE DR CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SUPPORT-DOR CASE; Judge: CHRISTINA SERRANO; Description: RSGN:COORDINATE DR CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SUPPORT-DOR CASE; Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant