This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 17:12:25 (UTC).

DOR VS CORNELIUS BIGGS JR

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DOR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CORNELIUS BIGGS JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is N MALONEY - GM K ERLENBACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

N MALONEY - GM K ERLENBACH

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BURNETT CASSANDRA LYNN

Melbourne, FL 32901-7275

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Respondent

BIGGS CORNELIUS EUGENE JR DOC Number - W80094

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: N MALONEY - GM K ERLENBACH; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant