This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 16:37:53 (UTC).

DOR VS ANTHONY THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DOR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ANTHONY THOMAS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ, LINDA PEREZ and J TAYLOR-GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

LINDA PEREZ

J TAYLOR-GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DANIELS SHANDICE

Cocoa, FL 32922-7576

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Respondent

THOMAS ANTHONY

Merritt Island, FL 32953-4359

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketVS FORM EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY (IV-D) (TITLE IV-D OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT) RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#12) JUDICIAL OFFICER NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#11) SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: LINDA PEREZ; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: J TAYLOR-GM L CASTALDI; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Disposition Date: 02/08/2021; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant