This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/04/2020 at 11:43:34 (UTC).

DOR VS AMARI HAIR

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 DOR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against AMARI HAIR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are R SEGAL-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and LINDA PEREZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

R SEGAL-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

LINDA PEREZ

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MAYO ASIAMEIK MARILYN DOC Number - E34219

Cocoa, FL 32926-4261

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

420 N Wickham Rd Ste A

Melbourne, FL 32935-8664

Respondent

HAIR AMARI NICHOLAS

Cocoa, FL 32927-3708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:00 PM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: LINDA PEREZ; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:00 PM; Judge: LINDA PEREZ; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE THE SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less