This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 10:13:25 (UTC).

DOR VS ALICIA FARNEY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 DOR filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ALICIA FARNEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHNSTEN MARY

Melbourne, FL 32935-3732

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

420 N Wickham Rd Ste A

Melbourne, FL 32935-8664

Respondent

FARNEY ALICIA DOC Number - E39208

Melbourne, FL 32935-3732

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SUPPORT DOR CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketWAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM; Amount: -301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM; Amount: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SUPPORT-DOR CASE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less