This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 10:05:38 (UTC).

DONNA MILLER VS UHAUL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 DONNA MILLER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UHAUL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RHONDA E. BABB and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RHONDA E. BABB

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER DONNA

Melbourne, FL 32901-4612

Defendant

UHAUL

1175 W New Haven Ave Ste 103

Melbourne, FL 32904-4063

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/25/2022: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (FOUND INDIGENT)

01/25/2022: CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (FOUND INDIGENT)

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

01/25/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

02/09/2022: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/18/2022: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

03/18/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

04/20/2022: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: OTHER COUNTY CIVIL 5001 - 8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (FOUND INDIGENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCO CIVIL ORIG-INDIGENT NO FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant