This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 15:43:23 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JEAN R POWERS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEAN R POWERS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

POWERS JEAN R

Melbourne, FL 32935-3320

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/16/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

03/17/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

04/06/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/29/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

09/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

09/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

09/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/15/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S167289; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTINA NICOLE CHARLET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S167289; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTINA NICOLE CHARLET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 11/15/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant