This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 07:23:48 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS GAIL JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAIL JOHNSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JOHNSON GAIL

Titusville, FL 32796-1570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURALLY THISHAN

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4835

Defendant Attorney

MOST JESSICA I

2401 Nw 23Rd St Ste 42

Oklahoma City, OK 73107-2431

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/20/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/20/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

02/26/2020: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

02/11/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/24/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/30/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

12/30/2019: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

12/30/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160857; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTINA NICOLE CHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160857; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTINA NICOLE CHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 03/20/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less