This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/29/2022 at 04:13:23 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE VS UNKNOWN HEIRS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 DEUTSCHE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS

ESTATE MAE SWEETING

ESTATE MAE B SWEETING

SWEETING ALFRED J

Cocoa, FL 32922-7207

SWEETING ALFRED J SR

Cocoa, FL 32922-7207

SWEETING GLORIA J

Cocoa, FL 32922-7151

CITY COCOA FLORIDA

65 Stone St, Co Mayor Mike Blake

Cocoa, FL 32922-7982

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Cocoa, FL 32922-7207

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Cocoa, FL 32922-7207

SWEETING STEPHANIE Y

Cocoa, FL 32922-7206

SWEETING ALFRED J JR

Bartow, FL 33830-4008

SWEETING EVETTE R

Cocoa, FL 32922-7206

Trustees

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

SECURITIZED ASSET BACKED RECEIVABLES LLC TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KITE-POWELL JULIA B

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

NIX JENNIFER B

Po Box 2873

Orlando, FL 32802-2873

Trustee Attorneys

TRAVIESO JENNIFER

5300 Atlantic Ave Ste 303

Delray Beach, FL 33484-8141

SCOLARO ANDREW

5300 Atlantic Ave Ste 303

Delray Beach, FL 33484-8141

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/20/2021: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

03/10/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

02/18/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/08/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/17/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

01/17/2022: MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

ORDER DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

11/23/2021: ORDER DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

MOTION OR PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

11/12/2021: MOTION OR PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE

09/20/2022: NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

09/20/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $50,000 OR LESS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/14/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $50,000 OR LESS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF FILING

09/13/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

CERTIFICATION OF CLERK REGARDING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

09/12/2022: CERTIFICATION OF CLERK REGARDING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE

09/07/2022: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

09/07/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/06/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 11:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE; Court Room Description: NBGC; User: dmo68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCAL:FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $50,000 OR LESS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Matter Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $0-$50000; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITIZED ASSET BACKED RECEIVABLES LLC TRUST 2005-HE1 MORT PASS-THROUGH CERT SERIES 2005-HE1 is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY COCOA is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW SCOLARO