This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 22:47:05 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE VS PANDEY HOTEL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 DEUTSCHE filed an Other lawsuit against PANDEY HOTEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIGROUP COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2016-C1

Defendants

PANDEY HOTEL CORPORATION

1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2699

PANDEY PRAKASH

Aurora, CO 80014-3505

PANDEY HOTEL COCOA BEACH LLC

1201 Hays St, Corporation Service Company Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32301-0434

Trustee

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorney

RECK KEVIN A

Foley And Lardner, 111 N Orange Ave Ste 1800

Orlando, FL 32801-2386

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/16/2021: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/16/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

03/16/2021: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

03/24/2021: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

COMPLIANCE OF NOTICE WITH PAYMENT DUE

03/24/2021: COMPLIANCE OF NOTICE WITH PAYMENT DUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

04/19/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

08/14/2021: ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/21/2021: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204801; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $0.82; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204795; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING THREE PAGES; Amount: $15.34; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204801; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $7.59; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204795; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $10.52; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204801; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING THREE PAGES; Amount: $11.09; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204795; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $1.14; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHEELER KASINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketASM: FORECLOSURE $250,000 & >; Amount: 1906.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-COMMERCIAL $250000 & >; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PANDEY HOTEL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PANDEY HOTEL COCOA BEACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEVIN RECK