This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/26/2022 at 01:20:37 (UTC).

DENNIS TANNER VS FEDNAT INSURA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 DENNIS TANNER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURA. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TANNER DENNIS

TANNER MARGARET

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Stc/O Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIMENTEL LUIS

925 S Federal Highway Sixth Floor

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

EL MEKKAOUI JENNIFER

14050 Nw 14Th St Ste 180

Sunrise, FL 33323-2851

HAYNES TITANIA N

884 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3812

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/08/2021: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/08/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/08/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

06/08/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

10/13/2021: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

10/13/2021: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/21/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

12/15/2021: ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/15/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID DUGAN; User: spp66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#30) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#29) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#27) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIMENTEL LUIS