This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 18:41:22 (UTC).

DEBBIE DIESNER VS STATE FARM

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 DEBBIE DIESNER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIESNER DEBBIE

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNELL DERRICK R

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-2604

Defendant Attorney

CALVO-PAQUETTE LOURDES MARIA

250 S Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/03/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/31/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

12/31/2019: COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/31/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/04/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/02/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/02/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/02/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/30/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/30/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:15 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#30) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160867; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DERRICK R CONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less