This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 10/21/2021 at 08:58:39 (UTC).

DAVID MORIN VS ST JOHNS INSURA

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 DAVID MORIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURA. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Trustees and Plaintiffs

MORIN DAVID A

MORIN BETTIE J

MORIN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Defendant

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

200 E Gaines St, C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee and Plaintiff Attorney

PIMENTEL LUIS

Defendant Attorney

MARANTE NESTOR A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

09/28/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/11/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND

06/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/29/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

06/07/2021: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/07/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/07/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/07/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#19) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docket(#18) ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIMENTEL LUIS