This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 10:02:37 (UTC).

DANIEL MARTIN PETERSON ET UX

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 DANIEL MARTIN PETERSON ET UX was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are R SEGAL-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

R SEGAL-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PETERSON ELIZABETH NICOLE

Melbourne, FL 32935-2730

PETERSON DANIEL MARTIN

Melbourne, FL 32935

Not Yet Classified

PETERSON SCOUT ROSEMARY

Melbourne, FL 32935-2730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketFINGERPRINT REPORT TO FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketVS FORM EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#9) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#7) CONFIDENTIAL BIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) SEALED CIVIL WORKFLOW CONTROL SYSTEM (CWCS) CRIMINAL RECORD RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) SEALED CIVIL WORKFLOW CONTROL SYSTEM (CWCS) CRIMINAL RECORD RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: NAME CHANGE; Disposition Date: 04/28/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822387; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: NAME CHANGE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PETERSON DANIEL MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: NAME CHANGE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: NAME CHANGE; Judge: R SEGAL-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less