This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:20:20 (UTC).

D TORRES-MONTANEZ VS T SOTO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 D TORRES-MONTANEZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against T SOTO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES-MONTANEZ DIONISIO

Worcester, MA 01610-4416

Respondent

SOTO TIFFANY

Melbourne, FL 32935

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLVIN R GREGORY

P O Box 3106

Orlando, FL 32802

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163409; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: R GREGORY COLVIN PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163409; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: R GREGORY COLVIN PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING PARENTING COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER DOMESTIC RELATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: CIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: CIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less