This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 11/21/2021 at 10:37:57 (UTC).

D SUPPAPPOLA VS GULFSTREAM

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 D SUPPAPPOLA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GULFSTREAM. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUPPAPPOLA DOMINICO

SUPPAPPOLA DALE

Defendant

GULFSTREAM PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIMENTEL LUIS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/30/2021: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/30/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

07/28/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/22/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED

10/26/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#14) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198836; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129863128; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PIMENTEL LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198836; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129863128; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PIMENTEL LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gulfstream Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIMENTEL LUIS