This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/17/2020 at 00:04:46 (UTC).

D L ROBB VS S A ROBB

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 D L ROBB filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against S A ROBB. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI and LESLIE J CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI

LESLIE J CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBB DAVID LEROY JR

Mims, FL 32754-5512

Respondent

ROBB STEPHANIE ANN

Titusville, FL 32780-6155

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:45 AM; Judge: LESLIE J CASTALDI; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#21) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:45 AM; Judge: LESLIE J CASTALDI; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#18) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#17) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less