This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/19/2020 at 14:37:45 (UTC).

D L MOORE VS T A MOORE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 D L MOORE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against T A MOORE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is M NABERHAUS-GM K ERLENBACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

M NABERHAUS-GM K ERLENBACH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE DEVON LEE

Land O Lakes, FL 34638-6174

Respondent

MOORE TAYNA ADDEEN

Palm Bay, FL 32909-8544

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#18) FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Disposition Date: 01/28/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: H138203; Party: R 1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $409.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MOORE TAYNA ADDEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#7) SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#5) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less