This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 06:59:22 (UTC).

D GRAHAM VS T GRAHAM

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 D GRAHAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against T GRAHAM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRAHAM DEANNA MEAGAN

Titusville, FL 32796-1275

Respondent

GRAHAM TRAVIS MICHAEL

Clearwater, FL 33759-3104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T779636; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $50.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GRAHAM DEANNA MEAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B204125; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $50.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GRAHAM DEANNA MEAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#21) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER LESLIE CASTALDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T776822; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $50.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GRAHAM DEANNA MEAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#18) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#17) PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#16) MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docket(#4) PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docket(#3) MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketASM: CIR CV DEFER PMT FEE CLK; Amount: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less