This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 10/16/2021 at 10:37:07 (UTC).

D CHOUINARD VS AMERICAN INTEGR

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 D CHOUINARD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGR. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOUINARD DENNIS

CHOUINARD ELLEN

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY FLORIDA

C/O Insurance Commissioner State Of Florida Process Section, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KANTOR LIDOR

708 E Colonial Dr Ste 103

Orlando, FL 32803-4652

GOSS ZAF G

708 E Colonial Dr Ste 103

Orlando, FL 32803-4652

Defendant Attorney

YORK JUSTIN K

Po Box 26349

Tampa, FL 33623-6349

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

09/16/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

09/09/2021: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

08/13/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/03/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

07/22/2021: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/19/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/19/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/07/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/07/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/07/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/07/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#10) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S197266; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 128246124; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KANTOR LIDOR

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOSS ZAF G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kantor, Lidor