This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/08/2020 at 07:09:28 (UTC).

D BADOLATO PA VS SAFECO INS CO

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 D BADOLATO PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INS CO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRISPIN BETH

D BADOLATO PA

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY ILLINOIS

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

PUJOLS BRIAN EDDY

9130 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1520

Miami, FL 33156-7868

 

Court Documents

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/06/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/03/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/14/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/14/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

JOINT STIPULATION

02/10/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#12) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158259; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158259; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less