This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/28/2020 at 13:19:56 (UTC).

D A BECKELHEIMER VS J R WEIUM

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 D A BECKELHEIMER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against J R WEIUM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C SERRANO - GM K ERLENBACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C SERRANO - GM K ERLENBACH

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WEIUM DOROTHY ANNE

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3410

BECKELHEIMER DOROTHY ANNE

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3410

Respondent

WEIUM JOHN ROLLIE

Houston, TX 77092-5632

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BONIFANT E ASHLEY

1275 S Patrick Dr Ste I

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3964

Respondent Attorney

FIORI CHRISTOPHE

1936 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 208

Tampa, FL 33607-6530

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) AGREEMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: V618619; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICE E ASHLEY BONIFANT P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: V618619; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICE E ASHLEY BONIFANT P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: ESTABLISH FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Disposition Date: 10/27/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: C SERRANO - GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less