This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/11/2022 at 10:04:28 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET VS ASHLEY SIMPSON

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CROWN ASSET filed an Other lawsuit against ASHLEY SIMPSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

COMENITY CAPITAL BANK

MY BJS PERKS MASTERCARD

Defendant

SIMPSON ASHLEY J

Melbourne, FL 32904-8214

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD IASIA B

100 2Nd Ave S Ste 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LA TOYA M

Po Box 1295

Minneola, FL 34755-1295

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/23/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/23/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/07/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/13/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209089; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139067987; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WARD IASIA B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209089; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139067987; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WARD IASIA B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $15001 - $30000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketASM: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMENITY CAPITAL BANK- BJ MC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, Iasia B