This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 14:06:59 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE VS T WETZEL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE filed an Other lawsuit against T WETZEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

WETZEL TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY JASON S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/30/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/30/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/30/2023: COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/01/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/01/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

05/19/2023: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S239133; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 165753685; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DRAGUTSKY JASON S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S239133; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 165753685; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DRAGUTSKY JASON S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less