This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 12:09:10 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE VS R HOLLAND

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R HOLLAND. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

HOLLAND RAELENE

ANTHONY RAEMELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY JASON S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/30/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/30/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/30/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/31/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/31/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/03/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

03/22/2023: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

DEFAULT ENTERED

04/06/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

05/02/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

05/08/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

05/08/2023: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

05/08/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/19/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000; Disposition Date: 05/19/2023; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less