Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 10:11:09 (UTC).

COOPER VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 COOPER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOPER CHIROPRACTIC NEUROLOGICAL DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA

STEVENS KYLE A

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

BENDER DAVID M

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

RIVERA BELINDA T

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/29/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/04/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/04/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

JOINT STIPULATION

01/13/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/10/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/04/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/31/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/31/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S156199; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S156199; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER CHIROPRACTIC NEUROLOGICAL DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENDER DAVID M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUSTER RICHARD