This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/03/2023 at 10:31:49 (UTC).

COOPER VS MGA INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 COOPER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOPER CHIROPRACTIC NEUROLOGICAL DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA

SANTIAGO MICHAEL

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Po Box 6200, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/06/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/06/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/09/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/09/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: wmb63

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S237446; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 164236498; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S237446; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 164236498; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less