This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/25/2020 at 07:19:33 (UTC).

COCONUT VS EUROPEAN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 COCONUT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EUROPEAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCONUT VILLAS PARTNERS LLC

Defendant

EUROPEAN SOPHISTICATED CLEANING SERVICES INC

1013 Ohio Ave, Co Pinnacle Accounting Llc

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-4418

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THALWITZER AARON BEHAR

257 North Orlando Ave

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-2916

Defendant Attorney

PIASECKA AGNIESZKA S

Po Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623-2028

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

MOTION TO TRANSFER

01/21/2020: MOTION TO TRANSFER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/13/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/21/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/06/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158221; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158221; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 03/27/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less