This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:14:14 (UTC).

COASTLINE VS DIRECT GENERAL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 COASTLINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COASTLINE IMAGING INC

FRANK AVRIL

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200, C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL PURVI S

1790 Highway A1A Ste 203

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-5440

Defendant Attorney

ALSAFEER ISAM J

1990 W New Haven Ave Ste 303

Melbourne, FL 32904-3924

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/22/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/22/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

09/24/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2021: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204890; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 135058883; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PATEL PURVI S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204890; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 135058883; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 100 - 500; Amount: $80.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PATEL PURVI S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER COUNTY CIVIL $100 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTLINE IMAGING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL PURVI S