This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 00:22:33 (UTC).

CLARA L HINES

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 CLARA L HINES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA DAVIDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LISA DAVIDSON

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HINES ANTHONY A

Rockledge, FL 32955-6107

HINES ANTHONY ALAN

Rockledge, FL 32955-6107

Not Yet Classified

HINES CLARA L

Melbourne, FL 32940-2625

Interested Party

HINES MICHAEL

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROOME CHRISTOPHER E

915 S Washington Ave

Titusville, FL 32780-8404

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KOSTRO VICTOR S

100 Rialto Pl Ste 707

Melbourne, FL 32901-3071

Interested Party Attorney

MARTINI PAMELA GRACE

6068 S Apopka Vineland Rd Ste 5

Orlando, FL 32819-4449

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORDER APPOINTING EXAMINING COMMITTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163092; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: PET DETERMINE CAPACITY; Amount: $231.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTOPHER BROOME ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AND ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INCAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: PET DETERMINE CAPACITY; Amount: 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER SOCIAL; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less