This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 08:48:23 (UTC).

CLARA L HINES

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 CLARA L HINES was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA DAVIDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LISA DAVIDSON

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Interested Parties

HINES ANTHONY A

Rockledge, FL 32955-6107

HINES ANTHONY ALAN

Rockledge, FL 32955-6107

HINES MICHAEL

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2039

Not Yet Classified

HINES CLARA L

Melbourne, FL 32940-2625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

BROOME CHRISTOPHER E

915 S Washington Ave

Titusville, FL 32780-8404

MARTINI PAMELA GRACE

6068 S Apopka Vineland Rd Ste 5

Orlando, FL 32819-4449

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#34) MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#32) FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#31) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#30) ORDER DECLARING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163091; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: FORMAL ADMIN $100K-$500K; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHRISTOPHER BROOME ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: GUARDIAN-PERSON/PROPERTY/ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $100K-$500K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN OF PERSON AND PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: GUARDIANSHIP; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less